LA HCR71 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes and directs suspension of licensing fees imposed on businesses by state agencies and licensing boards (EN DECREASE SG RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes and directs suspension of licensing fees imposed on businesses by state agencies and licensing boards (EN DECREASE SG RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HCR 71 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#791) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 71 FINAL PASSAGE (#697) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 71 ADOPT (#512) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 71 HCR 71 BY MR. SPEAKER (#194) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-04HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-06-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-01HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-01SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2020-06-01SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2020-05-29SenateReconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended.
2020-05-29SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended.
2020-05-28SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-28SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-05-19SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 89, nays 1. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20.
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-13HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2020-05-07HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HCR71&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170163
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170941
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173789
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179049
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173380
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176513
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176647
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177588
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178806
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179005
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170165
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171268
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173831
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177192
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179376
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173755
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177477
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178709

Bill Comments

feedback