LA HCR71 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes April of 2014 as End Distracted Driving Awareness Month
Title
Recognizes April of 2014 as End Distracted Driving Awareness Month
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 71 ADOPT (#697) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House Vote on HCR 71 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#702) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House Vote on HCR 71 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#702) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-06 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-05-05 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 91, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2014. |
2014-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2014-04-09 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-04-09 | House | Reconsidered. |
2014-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. |
2014-04-09 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |