LA HCR69 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study concerning means by which to improve the Medicaid estate recovery functions of the La. Department of Health
Title
Requests a study concerning means by which to improve the Medicaid estate recovery functions of the La. Department of Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 69 ADOPT (#1372) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HCR 69 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#920) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HCR 69 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#920) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-05-10 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2018-04-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-04-24 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |