LA HCR68 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that the secretary of state and registrars of voters take certain actions with respect to a toll-free number that the public can use to report election issues and problems
Title
Requests that the secretary of state and registrars of voters take certain actions with respect to a toll-free number that the public can use to report election issues and problems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 68 ADOPT (#874) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House Vote on HCR 68 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#428) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House Vote on HCR 68 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#428) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-19 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-25 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/2016. |
2016-04-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). |
2016-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-04-12 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |