LA HCR68 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the contributions of the Republic of Azerbaijan and the importance of promoting and fostering relationships with the people of Azerbaijan
Title
Recognizes the contributions of the Republic of Azerbaijan and the importance of promoting and fostering relationships with the people of Azerbaijan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-08 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |