LA HCR66 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Suspends the lower tier of the corporation franchise tax levied on domestic and foreign corporations and the initial tax levied on certain business entities subject to the corporate franchise tax (EN -$5,800,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suspends the lower tier of the corporation franchise tax levied on domestic and foreign corporations and the initial tax levied on certain business entities subject to the corporate franchise tax (EN -$5,800,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HCR 66 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#785) (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 66 FINAL PASSAGE (#696) (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 66 2/3 vote (#669) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HCR 66 PERMISSION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#682) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 66 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#192) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-04HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 66, nays 26, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-06-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-01HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-01SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 8 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2020-06-01SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2020-05-31HouseNotice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-31SenateRead by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 26 yeas and 8 nays.
2020-05-31SenateNotice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-31HouseBy a vote of 93 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-26SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-21SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-05-19SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 72, nays 24. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20.
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-13HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2020-05-07HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HCR66&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170013
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171147
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179039
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171022
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170639
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174819
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175780
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178892
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178978
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170016
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170654
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171257
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171505
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175037
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179268
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173749
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178331
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178450
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178697

Bill Comments

feedback