LA HCR66 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes the U.S. Congress and the Louisiana Congressional delegation to work towards equitable revenue sharing for Louisiana mineral and gas production
Title
Memorializes the U.S. Congress and the Louisiana Congressional delegation to work towards equitable revenue sharing for Louisiana mineral and gas production
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 66 CO-AUTHORS (#239) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 66 ADOPT (#238) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 66 ADOPT (#238) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-04-13 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-11 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |