LA HCR66 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-07 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-07 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To continue the Comite River Diversion Canal Task Force to study and make recommendations on the actions necessary to complete the Comite River Diversion Canal Project
Title
To continue the Comite River Diversion Canal Task Force to study and make recommendations on the actions necessary to complete the Comite River Diversion Canal Project
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on HCR 66 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#663) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 66 ADOPT (#370) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Vote on HCR 66 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#200) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 66 ADOPT (#370) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Vote on HCR 66 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#200) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-07 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/02/2015. |
2015-05-19 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-06 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 6, 2015. |
2015-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2015-04-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2015-04-21 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |