LA HCR65 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests a study of the current system of reporting deaths in correctional institutions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests a study of the current system of reporting deaths in correctional institutions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 65 CONCUR (#630) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - House Vote on HCR 65 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#655) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2023-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2023-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2023-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2023-06-02SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2023-06-02SenateRules suspended.
2023-05-31SenateReported favorably.
2023-05-26SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2023-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2023-05-25HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 100, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2023-05-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023.
2023-05-24HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-05-23HouseReported with amendments (9-0-1).
2023-05-01HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2023-04-27HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback