LA HCR60 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the La. Health Works Commission to develop policy recommendations for creating safer workplace environments for nurses and social service providers
Title
Urges the La. Health Works Commission to develop policy recommendations for creating safer workplace environments for nurses and social service providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HCR 60 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#922) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 60 ADOPT (#715) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 60 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#609) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 60 ADOPT (#715) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 60 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#609) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2019-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 100, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-28 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2019-05-28 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19. |
2019-05-22 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. |
2019-05-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-06 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |