LA HCR58 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Notice given.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Notice given.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends certain provisions of Title 29 of the La. Revised Statutes relative to public emergencies
Title
Suspends certain provisions of Title 29 of the La. Revised Statutes relative to public emergencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Notice given. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (9-7-1). |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |