LA HCR51 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the La. Department of Health to issue rules requiring reporting of immunization information
Title
Urges and requests the La. Department of Health to issue rules requiring reporting of immunization information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HCR 51 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#861) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 51 ADOPT (#782) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 51 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#385) (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 51 ADOPT (#782) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 51 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#385) (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-22 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 72, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/17. |
2017-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2017-05-01 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-04-27 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |