LA HCR48 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the House and Senate governmental affairs committees to meet and function as a joint committee to review the process of rulemaking by state agencies and the Louisiana Administrative Code and make recommendations relative thereto
Title
Requests the House and Senate governmental affairs committees to meet and function as a joint committee to review the process of rulemaking by state agencies and the Louisiana Administrative Code and make recommendations relative thereto
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 48 ADOPT (#449) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 48 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#189) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 48 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#189) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0-1). |
2020-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |