LA HCR48 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Danielle Davis, Matt Reynolds, Shelby Michaels, and Walter Smith for saving the life of a spectator
Title
Commends Danielle Davis, Matt Reynolds, Shelby Michaels, and Walter Smith for saving the life of a spectator
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 48 ADOPT (#205) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-04-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-04-01 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |