LA HCR48 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the Judicial Council to recommend guidelines and rules to the Supreme Court of La. for the qualification and standards on the use of court interpreters
Title
Urges the Judicial Council to recommend guidelines and rules to the Supreme Court of La. for the qualification and standards on the use of court interpreters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 48, ADOPT (#874) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-06-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-03 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-02 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-01 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-05-25 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-03 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2010-05-03 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 3, 2010. | |
2010-04-26 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-04-22 | Reported favorably (12-0-1). | |
2010-03-30 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |