LA HCR46 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the governor's executive assistant for coastal activities to coordinate a study among state agencies and make recommendations to the governor and the legislature relative to management of the Amite River Basin
Title
Urges and requests the governor's executive assistant for coastal activities to coordinate a study among state agencies and make recommendations to the governor and the legislature relative to management of the Amite River Basin
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 46 CONCUR (#678) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Vote on HCR 46 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#397) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Vote on HCR 46 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#397) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/3/2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021. |
2021-05-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2021-04-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2021-04-27 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |