LA HCR43 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests federal action on domestic oil and gas production
Title
Urges and requests federal action on domestic oil and gas production
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 43 CONCUR (#801) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Vote on HCR 43 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#253) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Vote on HCR 43 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#253) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-24 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-12 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-06 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2022-03-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2022-03-28 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |