LA HCR4 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the selection and authority of commissioners representing the state when a convention is called to propose amendments to the U.S. Constitution pursuant to Article V

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the selection and authority of commissioners representing the state when a convention is called to propose amendments to the U.S. Constitution pursuant to Article V

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 4 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1410) (Y: 70 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 4 ADOPT (#1395) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 4 ADOPT (#1028) (Y: 7 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2018-04-13 - House - House Vote on HCR 4 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#436) (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 70, nays 9, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-18HouseRules suspended.
2018-05-18HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-18SenateSenate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 21 yeas and 13 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2018-05-18SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2018-05-14SenateReconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2018-05-11SenateNotice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
2018-05-11SenateRead by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 7 yeas and 18 nays.
2018-05-11SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2018-05-03SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2018-05-02SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-13HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 55, nays 22. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-13HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-04-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/13/18.
2018-04-11HouseNotice given.
2018-03-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-03-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/21/18.
2018-03-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-14HouseReported favorably (6-0).
2018-03-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-12HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HCR4&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071629
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075150
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099612
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096936
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099534
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099562
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071632
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075235
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086438
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095926
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099497

Bill Comments

feedback