LA HCR39 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To continue the Comite River Diversion Canal Task Force for the purpose of studying and making recommendations on the actions necessary to complete the Comite River Diversion Canal Project
Title
To continue the Comite River Diversion Canal Task Force for the purpose of studying and making recommendations on the actions necessary to complete the Comite River Diversion Canal Project
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - House Vote on HCR 39 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1078) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 39 ADOPT (#879) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House Vote on HCR 39 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#677) (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 39 ADOPT (#879) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House Vote on HCR 39 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#677) (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2016. |
2016-05-19 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-10 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 80, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2016. |
2016-05-05 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2016-04-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-03-31 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-30 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |