LA HCR39 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Iota Theta Chapter of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc. upon the celebration of its 40th anniversary and recognizes March 31, 2012 as Delta Sigma Theta Day
Title
Commends the Iota Theta Chapter of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc. upon the celebration of its 40th anniversary and recognizes March 31, 2012 as Delta Sigma Theta Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 39, ADOPT (#39) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2012-03-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-03-14 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-03-13 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-03-13 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2012-03-12 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |