LA HCR36 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Tuesday, April 9, 2013, as Equal Pay Day in La.
Title
Recognizes Tuesday, April 9, 2013, as Equal Pay Day in La.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 36, ADOPT (#15) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-04-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 21 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |