LA HCR35 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes April 10, 2018, as Liquified Natural Gas Day at the Legislature
Title
Recognizes April 10, 2018, as Liquified Natural Gas Day at the Legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 35 ADOPT (#351) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-04-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-04-10 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |