LA HCR32 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes April 11, 2018, as Louisiana Entrepreneur Day at the state capitol and commends entrepreneurs and small business owners
Title
Recognizes April 11, 2018, as Louisiana Entrepreneur Day at the state capitol and commends entrepreneurs and small business owners
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 32 ADOPT (#317) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-04-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-09 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |