LA HCR3 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the expenditure limit for Fiscal Year 2016-2017 (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Reduces the expenditure limit for Fiscal Year 2016-2017 (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - House - House Vote on HCR 3 RECORD VOTE (#943) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution, having the required two-thirds vote of the elected members, was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2016. |
2016-05-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-16 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2016-03-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |