LA HCR29 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Clean Slate Task Force (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Clean Slate Task Force (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 29 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#295) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-06-01SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted.
2020-06-01SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2020-05-31SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-05-28SenateReported favorably.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2020-05-22HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported favorably (12-0-1).
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2020-05-07HouseReported favorably (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2020-03-16HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback