LA HCR29 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests DOTD to install a red light at the intersection of North Acadia Road on La. Highway 648 (Percy Brown Road) in Lafourche Parish and to reduce the speed along this route
Title
Requests DOTD to install a red light at the intersection of North Acadia Road on La. Highway 648 (Percy Brown Road) in Lafourche Parish and to reduce the speed along this route
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 29, ADOPT (#756) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-06-01 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-25 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-05-24 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-05-17 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-03 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2010-05-03 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 3, 2010. | |
2010-04-27 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-04-26 | Reported favorably (12-0-1). | |
2010-03-30 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |