LA HCR260 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-20 - Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-20 - Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the governor, through the commissioner of administration, in preparing and submitting the 2011-12 general appropriation bill to exclude all expenditures that are not "for the ordinary operating expenses of government, public charities, pensions, and the public debt or interest thereon"
Title
Requests the governor, through the commissioner of administration, in preparing and submitting the 2011-12 general appropriation bill to exclude all expenditures that are not "for the ordinary operating expenses of government, public charities, pensions, and the public debt or interest thereon"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HCR260 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=718519 |