LA HCR26 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests a joint subcommittee of the House Committee on Insurance and Senate Committee on Insurance to undertake a study to make recommendations for proposed legislation relative to balance or surprise billing in Louisiana

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests a joint subcommittee of the House Committee on Insurance and Senate Committee on Insurance to undertake a study to make recommendations for proposed legislation relative to balance or surprise billing in Louisiana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 26 ADOPT (#144) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote on HCR 26 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#129) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-29HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-29HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-06-28SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2020-06-28SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2020-06-26SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-06-25HouseRead by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-25HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-06-25HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-06-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/25/20.
2020-06-24HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-24HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-24HouseReported with amendments (9-0).
2020-06-23HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HCR26&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183515
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183780
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184144
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184710
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183731
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183770
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184082
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183516
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183891
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184707
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184095
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184630

Bill Comments

feedback