LA HCR21 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Children and Family Services to study the expedited process fee paid by child support obligors
Title
Requests the Department of Children and Family Services to study the expedited process fee paid by child support obligors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 21 ADOPT (#706) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 21 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#438) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 21 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#438) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-16 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2018-03-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-27 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |