LA HCR21 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 88-53-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 88-53-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses sympathies of the legislature to those affected by the March 2016 floods and offers condolences to the families of those who lost their lives across the state in those disasters
Title
Expresses sympathies of the legislature to those affected by the March 2016 floods and offers condolences to the families of those who lost their lives across the state in those disasters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 21 AMENDMENT # BY PEACOCK ADOPT (#42) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-03-23 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-03-23 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-03-22 | House | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-03-22 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |