LA HCR21 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes April 14, 2015, as Coastal Day at the Louisiana Legislature
Title
Recognizes April 14, 2015, as Coastal Day at the Louisiana Legislature
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 21 ADOPT (#20) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-04-15 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-04-15 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |