LA HCR21 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the attorney general to review and report to the legislative governmental affairs committees and requests the governmental affairs committees to study and make recommendations all relative to the use of state general funds for lobbying and public relations purposes
Title
Requests the attorney general to review and report to the legislative governmental affairs committees and requests the governmental affairs committees to study and make recommendations all relative to the use of state general funds for lobbying and public relations purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HCR 21 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#875) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 21 HCR 21 BY REP TALBOT (#786) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House Vote on HCR 21 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#253) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 21 HCR 21 BY REP TALBOT (#786) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House Vote on HCR 21 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#253) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/04/2013. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-06 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/6/2013. |
2013-04-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2013-04-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |