LA HCR20 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that the governor appoint additional women to public postsecondary education boards so that women will comprise at least fifty percent of each board's membership by July 1, 2023
Title
Requests that the governor appoint additional women to public postsecondary education boards so that women will comprise at least fifty percent of each board's membership by July 1, 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 20 CO-AUTHORS (#386) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 20 CONCUR (#385) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HCR 20 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#226) (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 20 CONCUR (#385) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HCR 20 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#226) (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/20/2021. |
2021-05-19 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-18 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-05 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 76, nays 12. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021. |
2021-04-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2021-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |