LA HCR2 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-07 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-07 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Applies to congress under U.S. Const. Art. V to call a convention of the states to propose U.S. constitutional amendments to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, limit federal government power, and provide for term limits for federal officials and members of congress
Title
Applies to congress under U.S. Const. Art. V to call a convention of the states to propose U.S. constitutional amendments to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, limit federal government power, and provide for term limits for federal officials and members of congress
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - House Vote on HCR 2 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#197) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-06 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 60, nays 38. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 6, 2015. |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (6-3). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-03-13 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/13/2015. |
2015-03-09 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-03-09 | House | Prefiled. |