LA HCR197 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Ruth Johnson for her outstanding public service as she departs the position of secretary of the Dept. of Children and Family Services
Title
Commends Ruth Johnson for her outstanding public service as she departs the position of secretary of the Dept. of Children and Family Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 197, ADOPT (#1690) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-04 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-03 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-06-03 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2012-06-01 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-06-01 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |