LA HCR19 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Signed by the President of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates May 19-25, 2019, as Emergency Medical Services Week

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates May 19-25, 2019, as Emergency Medical Services Week

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 19 ADOPT (#37) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-04-15HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-04-10HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-04-10SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2019-04-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-09HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback