LA HCR18 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends La. State Trooper Justin Martin of Troop I in Lafayette for his dedication to serving and protecting the public trust
Title
Commends La. State Trooper Justin Martin of Troop I in Lafayette for his dedication to serving and protecting the public trust
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 18, ADOPT (#16) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-04-27 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-04-25 | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |