LA HCR170 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Bd. of Regents and the Bd. of Supervisors of Community and Technical Colleges jointly to study offering community college services to the Greater St. Mary Parish Area
Title
Requests the Bd. of Regents and the Bd. of Supervisors of Community and Technical Colleges jointly to study offering community college services to the Greater St. Mary Parish Area
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 170 ADOPT (#801) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on HCR 170 MOTION TO ADOPT (#686) (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on HCR 170 MOTION TO ADOPT (#686) (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 76, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-29 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |