LA HCR17 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Holy Cross School robotics team on winning the 2018 Louisiana state robotics championship
Title
Commends the Holy Cross School robotics team on winning the 2018 Louisiana state robotics championship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 17 ADOPT (#150) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-03-28 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-03-27 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-26 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |