LA HCR15 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes the Natchitoches Tribe of Louisiana as an Indian tribe of the state (EG NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizes the Natchitoches Tribe of Louisiana as an Indian tribe of the state (EG NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 15 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#350) (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2017-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-18HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 86, nays 1. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-18HouseCalled from the calendar.
2017-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17.
2017-05-16HouseNotice given.
2017-05-11HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2017-05-08HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/17.
2017-05-03HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-02HouseReported favorably (9-0-1).
2017-04-11HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2017-04-10HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback