LA HCR15 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the Manchac Swamp Greenway for its potential to serve as a cultural asset and economic engine
Title
Recognizes the Manchac Swamp Greenway for its potential to serve as a cultural asset and economic engine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 15 HCR 15 BY PUGH (#31) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-03-23 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-03-23 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-03-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |