LA HCR15 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study of the most effective means by which to reduce Louisiana's rate of suicide
Title
Requests a study of the most effective means by which to reduce Louisiana's rate of suicide
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Burns [R] | Sen. R. Bret Allain [R] | Sen. Sherri Cheek [R] | Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
Sen. Elbert Guillory [D] | Sen. David Heitmeier [D] | Sen. Fred Mills [R] | Rep. Francis Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 15 ADOPT (#422) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |