LA HCR141 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes congress in opposition to the Biggert-Waters Flood Insurance Reform Act of 2012
Title
Memorializes congress in opposition to the Biggert-Waters Flood Insurance Reform Act of 2012
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 141 ADOPT (#988) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HCR 141 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#864) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HCR 141 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#864) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2013. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-05-29 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2013-05-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2013-05-20 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |