LA HCR129 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs each public body that has a custodian of public records to make the identity and contact information of the custodian available to the public
Title
Directs each public body that has a custodian of public records to make the identity and contact information of the custodian available to the public
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 129 CONCUR (#920) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - House Vote on HCR 129 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#643) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - House Vote on HCR 129 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#643) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-29 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013. |
2013-05-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-05-14 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |