LA HCR126 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences on the death of Christopher L. "Chris" Duncan
Title
Expresses condolences on the death of Christopher L. "Chris" Duncan
Sponsors
Rep. Les Farnum [R] | Sen. Ronnie Johns [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 126 CONCUR (#1027) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021. |
2021-06-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-09 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |