LA HCR126 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes May 1-June 14, 2012, as National Military Appreciation Month
Title
Recognizes May 1-June 14, 2012, as National Military Appreciation Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 126, ADOPT (#924) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 126, CO-AUTHORS (#923) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 126, CO-AUTHORS (#923) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2012-05-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-15 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-14 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2012-05-14 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | |
2012-05-08 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2012-05-07 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-05-07 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |