LA HCR12 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses intent of the legislature regarding Act No. 181 of the 2012 R.S.
Title
Expresses intent of the legislature regarding Act No. 181 of the 2012 R.S.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 12 ADOPT (#420) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House Vote on HCR 12 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#251) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House Vote on HCR 12 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#251) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-06 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/6/2013. |
2013-04-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2013-04-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |