LA HCR107 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education take all necessary actions to provide that no measure of student growth be used in the evaluation of teachers for the 2020-2021 school year
Title
Requests that the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education take all necessary actions to provide that no measure of student growth be used in the evaluation of teachers for the 2020-2021 school year
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on HCR 107 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#868) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |