LA HCR105 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the members of the GU272 Descendants Association upon their family reunion on June 9, 2018
Title
Commends the members of the GU272 Descendants Association upon their family reunion on June 9, 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Brass [D] | Sen. Edward Price [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 105 ADOPT (#1125) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-05-14 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |