LA HCR104 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to make improvements to the appearance of state entry points on interstate highways
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to make improvements to the appearance of state entry points on interstate highways
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 104 ADOPT (#1175) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |